AVON YOUTH CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Independent youth club proving recreation, sporting and extending aspirations
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Bristol City
- North Somerset
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
- 12 November 2015: CIO registration
- 01 March 2017: Funds received from 225891 THE AVON CLUB FOR YOUNG PEOPLE
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Kenneth Price | Chair | 14 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Richard James Walden King | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Jonathan Rhys David | Trustee | 11 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Amy Sweet | Trustee | 03 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Helen Price | Trustee | 14 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
DAVID GORDON SUTTON | Trustee | 01 March 1990 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £56.17k | £59.55k | £63.86k | £66.91k | £88.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.19k | £61.02k | £80.22k | £104.74k | £56.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £19.76k | £25.47k | £20.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 20 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 12 Nov 2015
Charitable objects
TO HELP AND EDUCATE YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH THEIR LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES IN ORDER THAT THEY ARE ENABLED TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL, EMOTIONAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES, THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED
Contact information
- Address:
-
1A Raynes Road
BRISTOL
BS3 2DJ
- Phone:
- 07974813319
- Email:
- mattdavid38@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window