DARREN WRIGHT FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1167130
Regulatory alert
Removed charity

Charity overview

Regulatory alerts

Activities - how the charity spends its money

For the public benefit the relief of the needs of disabled people and their families.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Bristol City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 May 2016: CIO registration
  • 16 April 2020: Removed (Removed by application)
  • 16 April 2020: Funds transferred to
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

No financial information provided for the past 5 financial periods

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 June 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 01 June 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 01 June 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 01 June 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 01 June 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 01 June 2017 Not submitted