TEAM EVIE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We help sick children and their families; during transport to hospital, in hospital, in the community and with bereavement support - we work primarily in Cumbria and the North East
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cumbria
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
Governance
- 20 November 2015: CIO registration
- 27 September 2022: Funds received from 1118636 JACK AND JILL AT SAINT MARY'S
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jill Johnston | Chair | 20 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Robert Nordon | Trustee | 20 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Buchanan | Trustee | 30 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
ABIGAIL CLUCAS | Trustee | 30 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Hazel Johnston | Trustee | 20 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN JOHNSTON | Trustee | 20 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Emma Ivison | Trustee | 20 November 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £73.60k | £100.73k | £90.35k | £116.31k | £107.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £61.97k | £53.36k | £141.76k | £78.09k | £101.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £14.80k | £24.99k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 02 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 02 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 11 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 11 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 09 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 09 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 27 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 27 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 20 Nov 2015 as amended on 24 Feb 2020
Charitable objects
The objects of the CIO are the relief of sickness and preservation of health of children and their families by the provision of equipment, resources and bereavement support.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 2b
Gate House
Hallwood Road
Workington
Cumbria
CA14 4JR
- Phone:
- 07730010014
- Email:
- info@teamevie.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window