ALABAMA ROT RESEARCH FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote research into all aspects of the disease known as Alabama Rot (cutaneous and renal glomerular vasculopathy or CRGV) in dogs on terms that the results of such research are published with the aim of advancing education in the disease and guiding treatment and prevention strategies relieving the suffering of dogs who are in need of care and attention.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 21 May 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 14 March 2016: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHAEL BARLOW | Chair | 21 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
JENNY PEEL | Trustee | 21 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
REBECCA FIELDING | Trustee | 21 May 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 21/05/2020 | 21/05/2021 | 21/05/2022 | 21/05/2023 | 21/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.06k | £14.23k | £9.14k | £10.76k | £14.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.90k | £2.99k | £39.28k | £18.58k | £17.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 21 May 2024 | 03 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 21 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 21 May 2023 | 29 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 21 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 21 May 2022 | 17 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 21 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 21 May 2021 | 17 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 21 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 21 May 2020 | 20 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 21 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 15/02/2016
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE RESEARCH INTO ALL ASPECTS OF THE DISEASE KNOWN AS ALABAMA ROT (CUTANEOUS AND RENAL GLOMERULAR VASCULOPATHY OR CRVG) IN DOGS ON TERMS THAT THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH ARE PUBLISHED WITH THE AIM OF ADVANCING EDUCATION IN THE DISEASE AND GUIDING TREATMENT AND PREVENTION STRATEGIES RELIEVING THE SUFFERING OF DOGS WHO ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Keetons Hill
Sheffield
S2 4NW
- Phone:
- 07831712060
- Email:
- enquiries@arrf.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window