HEMEL HEMPSTEAD METHODIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Hemel Hempstead Methodist Church has the use of a modern church building and provides opportunity (open to all) for public worship, Bible study, social meetings particularly for the elderly and innovative styles of worship for young people and families. The church also facilitates involvement in community ventures such as the local food bank, services for the homeless and Street Pastors.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

23 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Buckinghamshire
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 07 December 2015: Previously excepted registration
- HHMC (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
23 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Andrew John Brazier | Chair | 01 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Paul Andrew Norrie | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kirsty Ruth Bowman | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Rose Thorn | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Kay Whyte | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mary Lesley Blencowe | Trustee | 18 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael Lees | Trustee | 18 May 2021 |
|
|||||
Sheila Ann Daly | Trustee | 10 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mrs S Parke | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
J de Bourcier | Trustee | 25 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Mr J P Lewis | Trustee | 12 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
R BLENCOWE | Trustee | 01 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
L CAMPBELL | Trustee | 01 May 2014 |
|
|||||
L FAUPEL | Trustee | 01 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
P GEORGE | Trustee | 01 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
C O'REILLY | Trustee | 01 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
J WALKER | Trustee | 01 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
G BURTON | Trustee | 01 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
A PENNYCOOK | Trustee | 06 April 2009 |
|
|
||||
G CHIDWICK | Trustee | 01 April 2006 |
|
|
||||
S DYCE | Trustee | 01 April 2006 |
|
|||||
J HARRIS | Trustee | 01 April 2006 |
|
|||||
J LEWIS | Trustee | 01 April 2006 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £104.49k | £77.40k | £58.33k | £80.40k | £59.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £81.04k | £66.38k | £70.36k | £68.11k | £75.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 06 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 06 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 23 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 23 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 17 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 17 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 01 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 01 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 08 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 08 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976) ADOPTED 01 JAN 2005
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE METHODIST CHURCH ARE AND SHALL BE DEEMED TO HAVE BEEN SINCE THE DATE OF UNION THE ADVANCEMENT OF - (A) THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL STANDARDS AND THE DISCIPLINE OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (B) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CONNEXIONAL, DISTRICT, CIRCUIT, LOCAL OR OTHER ORGANISATION OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (C) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY SOCIETY OR INSTITUTION SUBSIDUARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH; (D) ANY PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CHARITY BEING A CHARITY SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hemel Hempstead Methodist Church
270 Northridge Way
HEMEL HEMPSTEAD
HP1 2AU
- Phone:
- 01442249756
- Email:
- hemelmethodist@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window