SOMETHING CHRONIC: RE-IMAGINING CHRONIC PAIN THROUGH THE ARTS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We promote the social inclusion of people living with chronic pain in the UK who are excluded from society, or parts of society, due to the pain they suffer by using the arts to raise awareness of such conditions and to engage chronic pain sufferers in arts-based social activities assisting them to integrate into society. We hold events aimed at helping individuals reclaim their voice and bodies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charitable Purposes
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Oxfordshire
- Throughout London
Governance
- 05 September 2016: CIO registration
- 12 November 2020: Removed (Removed by application)
- 12 November 2020: Funds transferred to 1145561 PAIN UK
- SOMETHING CHRONIC (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2017 | 30/04/2018 | 30/04/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £748 | £306 | £155 | |
|
Total expenditure | £324 | £393 | £149 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2019 | 20 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2019 | 20 February 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 April 2018 | 14 February 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2018 | 20 February 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 April 2017 | 26 March 2018 | 26 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2017 | 25 February 2018 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 05 Sep 2016
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION OF PEOPLE LIVING WITH CHRONIC PAIN IN THE UK WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, DUE TO THE CHRONIC PAIN THEY SUFFER BY USING THE ARTS TO RAISE AWARENESS OF SUCH CONDITIONS AND TO ENGAGE CHRONIC PAIN SUFFERERS IN ARTS-BASED SOCIAL ACTIVITIES ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
IN THE UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window