Financial history NORTH WEST TURKISH COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1166380
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 04/04/2020 04/04/2021 04/04/2022 04/04/2023 04/04/2024
Total gross income £3.14k £1.37k £13.51k £17.74k £17.92k
Total expenditure £3.22k £1.66k £12.12k £14.91k £16.75k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A