Pontypridd Ministry Area Council

Charity number: 1165251
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Ministry Area serves all Anglican Churches in and around Pontypridd by providing religious services and community-based projects. The geographical borders of the Ministry Area are created by the Church in Wales.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £325,995
Total expenditure: £497,098

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Rhondda Cynon Taff

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 January 2016: Standard registration
  • 22 June 2016: Funds received from 1151985 ST CATHERINE'S CHURCH PONTYPRIDD PAROCHIAL CHURCH ...
  • 27 July 2016: Funds received from 1150348 THE P.C.C. OF THE PARISH OF GLYNTAFF RHYDYFELIN AN...
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • Pontypridd Ministry Area (Working name)
  • THE PARISH OF PONTYPRIDD PCC (Working name)
  • THE PARISH OF PONTYPRIDD PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Jeremy Heuslein Trustee 24 June 2023
None on record
Rev Rachel Campbell Trustee 24 April 2023
None on record
ANDREW SOWERBY Trustee 24 April 2023
None on record
Ian Sandford Trustee 24 April 2023
None on record
Karen Murphy Trustee 24 April 2023
None on record
Rev Charlotte Rushton Trustee 05 May 2021
None on record
William Keith Johns Trustee 18 April 2021
None on record
Elaine Rees Trustee 15 November 2020
None on record
Helen Gulliford Trustee 28 April 2019
None on record
Christine Mary Godfrey Trustee 15 April 2018
None on record
David Roger Morgan Trustee 15 April 2018
None on record
Sheila Majorie Nurse Trustee 12 July 2017
None on record
Ray Minton Trustee 19 November 2015
PONTYPRIDD FOODBANK
Received: On time
BARBARA MINTON Trustee 28 September 2015
PONTYPRIDD FOODBANK
Received: On time
NEAL PHILIP WOOD Trustee 28 September 2015
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £368.06k £310.65k £261.67k £281.80k £326.00k
Total expenditure £354.35k £292.73k £259.54k £281.77k £497.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £25.45k £32.80k N/A £400 £68.16k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 22 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 22 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 15 August 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022

(These accounts
have been qualified)

15 August 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 05 November 2022 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021

(These accounts
have been qualified)

05 November 2022 5 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 07 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 07 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
The Vicarage
Gelliwastad Grove
PONTYPRIDD
Mid Glamorgan
CF37 2BS
Phone:
07383666995