Financial history FIRST STEP LEICESTER LEICESTERSHIRE AND RUTLAND

Charity number: 1165062
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £173.48k £231.27k £224.70k £268.31k £210.07k
Total expenditure £137.09k £203.70k £218.86k £241.72k £232.28k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £75.06k £115.83k £132.81k £158.34k £131.87k