Trustees EARLYBIRDS PLAYGROUP

Charity Number: 1165010
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Nicola Giles Trustee 07 November 2024
None on record
Wendy Henderson Trustee 01 September 2024
None on record
Margaret Hewis Trustee 10 January 2022
None on record
Sarah Jones Trustee 19 November 2021
None on record
Matthew Bishop Trustee 08 April 2021
None on record
Rhiannon Trillo Trustee 12 November 2020
None on record