BELOVED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Beloved offers support to women working in massage parlours in Bristol and surrounding areas. Our aim is to offer love, hope, time to talk and support in various ways: We distribute personal attack alarms, safety information, and signpost the women to local organisations such as specialist sexual health clinics, homeless shelters, local drug projects and weekly friendship groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bristol City
Governance
- 18 November 2016: CIO registration
- 31 May 2023: Funds received from 1132958 LIVING HOPE CHURCH (BATH) CIO
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £140.92k | £111.90k | £137.76k | £150.38k | £136.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £117.42k | £143.69k | £141.35k | £139.83k | £124.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 08 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 16 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 18 Nov 2016 as amended on 30 Nov 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND HARDSHIP, IN PARTICULAR BY WORKING WITH THOSE INVOLVED IN PROSTITUTION OR AT RISK OF BEING DRAWN INTO PROSTITUTION AS A RESULT OF UNEMPLOYMENT, POVERTY, DEPRIVATION, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, ILL-HEALTH, OR DISABILITY AND TO DO SO: (I) FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, (II) THROUGHOUT THE UNITED KINGDOM, (III) IN PURSUANCE OF CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES, AND (IV) IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
FAO BELOVED c/o Burton Sweet
5 Farleigh Court
Old Weston Road
Flax Bourton
BRISTOL
BS48 1UR
- Phone:
- 07541366577
- Email:
- info@beloved.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window