READING FAMILIES' FORUM CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To enable young people aged 0 to 25 years with disabilities or special educational needs and their families to meet and discuss issues with service providers in Reading Borough Council, and local NHS and voluntary sector. To represent parents' and carers' views to these providers and work to coproduce policy. To promote best practice in these services.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £6,430 from 1 government contract(s) and £17,394 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Reading
Governance
- 18 April 2016: CIO registration
- RFF (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RAMONA GILLIAN ELIZABETH BRIDGMAN | Chair | 18 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Sergio De Gregorio | Trustee | 17 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kira Molly Remi Lloyd | Trustee | 20 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lynsey McDonald | Trustee | 28 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
PAULINE HAMILTON | Trustee | 18 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr ALICE ELEANOR CARTER | Trustee | 18 April 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.00k | £13.42k | £24.69k | £15.64k | £24.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.46k | £12.43k | £20.40k | £22.56k | £23.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £10.50k | N/A | £6.43k | |
|
Income from government grants | £15.00k | £13.42k | £14.18k | £15.41k | £17.39k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 05 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 08 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 07 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 18 Apr 2016
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF YOUNG PEOPLE AGED 0-15 YEARS WITH DISABILTIES AND / OR SPECIAL EDUCATIONAL NEEDS AND TO ASSIST IN ADVANCING THEM IN LIFE SO THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE READING BOROUGH COUNCIL AREA BY: • SETTING UP STRUCTURES AND PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES (SURVEYS, MEETINGS, EVENTS, INFORMATION DAYS) TO FACILITATE TWO-WAY COMMUNICATION BETWEEN FAMILIES AND SERVICE PROVIDERS; • PROMOTING AND IMPLEMENTING CO-PRODUCTION IN DECISION MAKING AND PLANNING FOR FUTURE SERVICE PROVISION, SO THAT PARENTS AND CARERS CAN CONTRIBUTE TO IMPROVEMENTS IN SERVICES; • PROMOTING THE SHARING OF BEST PRACTICE, INFORMED BY STATUTORY AND VOLUNTARY AGENCIES WITHIN HEALTH, EDUCATION, SOCIAL CARE AND DISABILITY.
Area of benefit
IN THE READING BOROUGH COUNCIL AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 Carisbrooke Close
Caversham
Reading
RG4 6SB
- Phone:
- 07516 185380
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window