ROOM TO LEARN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancing education and relieving poverty amongst children aged 3-15 for the public benefit, primarily but not exclusively in India, particularly but not exclusively by the provision of school buildings, teachers, equipment and transport to meet their educational needs. Currently first schooling project is in Kalimpong, West Bengal, India.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- India
Governance
- 04 February 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN FLEMING | Chair | 08 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
Tom Rowan Gardner | Trustee | 09 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Hall | Trustee | 09 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Hall | Trustee | 09 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elloit May | Trustee | 09 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Frances Elizabeth Mills | Trustee | 12 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jacques Frederic Honore | Trustee | 16 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Corinna Anne Whitfield | Trustee | 06 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Brian Frederick Charles Mills | Trustee | 06 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Bradshaw | Trustee | 10 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
DESMOND MILLS | Trustee | 08 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER MAXWELL | Trustee | 08 August 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.19k | £19.44k | £18.12k | £22.90k | £13.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.68k | £6.09k | £14.78k | £16.13k | £17.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 17 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 17 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 17 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 17 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 08 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 08 April 2024 | 253 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 29 March 2023 | 242 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 29 March 2023 | 242 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 03 September 2021 | 35 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 03 September 2021 | 35 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 04 Feb 2016
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND RELIEVE POVERTY AMONGST CHILDREN AGED 3-15 FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN INDIA, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF SCHOOL BUILDINGS, TEACHERS, EQUIPMENT AND TRANSPORT TO MEET THEIR EDUCATIONAL NEEDS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Manor Lodge
Old Minster Lovell
Minster Lovell
Witney
OX29 0RN
- Phone:
- 01993775479
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window