MURPHY'S ARMY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Celebrating and supporting the invaluable contributions of service animals, past, present, and future. We provide vital support to service animals both active and retired, ensuring they receive care, welfare, training, protection, and support tailored to their needs. We commemorate their sacrifices and achievements while promoting their welfare and legacy for generations to come.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 23 June 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KAREN PRITCHARD | Trustee | 04 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Bernard Alderson | Trustee | 21 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julie Anne McDonnell | Trustee | 21 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
PUILING MA | Trustee | 15 August 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £70.16k | £46.61k | £59.06k | £75.51k | £56.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £60.42k | £44.42k | £63.19k | £70.57k | £51.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 23 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 03 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 03 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 23 Jun 2016 as amended on 12 Apr 2025
Charitable objects
The objects of the CIO are: For the benefit of the public, to promote the humane treatment and welfare of service animals by: a) Providing financial assistance to ensure the care, welfare, training, and wellbeing of service animals, both active and retired, in need due to age, illness, injury, adverse circumstances, mistreatment, or other welfare challenges; b) Raising public awareness about the vital contributions of service animals, both past and present, through education, outreach initiatives and lasting memorials.
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 ROBINSON COURT
BRADFORD
BD7 2QP
- Phone:
- 07778540641
- Email:
- theteam@murphysarmy.org
- Website:
-
HTTP://MURPHYSARMY.ORG/
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window