Trustees 3RD WOODTHORPE (ST MARK'S) SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 507206

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew George Burger | Trustee | 15 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Anne Mellors | Trustee | 22 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tara Louise Rose | Trustee | 22 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lawrence Allan Staniforth | Trustee | 23 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Robert Douglas Powley | Trustee | 02 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rosalie Hawks | Trustee | 30 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Graham Wilson | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Simeon Scott Ractliffe | Trustee | 03 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
BENJAMIN DANVERS | Trustee | 14 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
TRACEY BOX | Trustee | 06 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL SMITH | Trustee | 06 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
DEREK CORKE | Trustee | 21 November 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.