COOL CATS CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of children and their families, resident predominantly but not exclusively in the Community of Rhyl, North Wales, through the provision of day care and pre-school facilities for children aged between 2.5 and 13 years, which stimulates their growth and development through safe and stimulating play.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £19,256 from 1 government contract(s) and £2,495 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Conwy
- Denbighshire
Governance
- 05 August 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Care Inspectorate Wales (CIW)
- Estyn: Her Majesty's Inspectorate For Education And Training In Wales
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jessica Myatt-Jones | Chair | 17 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paula Roberts | Trustee | 29 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amiee Tomkins | Trustee | 29 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Harcourt | Trustee | 29 May 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £183.83k | £198.46k | £158.80k | £181.58k | £210.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £198.24k | £181.68k | £178.76k | £158.58k | £207.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £19.26k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £80.70k | £20.19k | N/A | £2.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 March 2024 | 46 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 17 March 2024 | 46 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 February 2024 | 394 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 29 February 2024 | 394 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 January 2023 | 339 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 05 January 2023 | 339 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 February 2022 | 387 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 February 2022 | 387 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 05 Aug 2016
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES, RESIDENT PREDOMINANTLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN THE COMMUNITY OF RHYL, NORTH WALES, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF DAY CARE AND PRE-SCHOOL FACILITIES FOR CHILDREN AGED BETWEEN 3 AND 13, WHICH STIMULATES THEIR GROWTH AND DEVELOPMENT THROUGH SAFE AND STIMULATING PLAY
Contact information
- Address:
-
COOL CATS CLUB
42 Spruce Avenue
RHYL
LL18 3SU
- Phone:
- 01745330079
- Email:
- coolcatsclub@rocketmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window