THE BRADLEY FAMILY CHARITABLE FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
the objects of the trust are to advance such charitable purposes as the trustees see fit from time to time in particular but not limited to advancing the Christian religion for the public benefit by making donations and grants to charities in accordance with Christian principles.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 28 January 2016: Standard registration
- 18 August 2021: Removed (Funds spent (by trustees))
No other names
- Investment
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2017 | 01/04/2018 | 01/04/2019 | 01/04/2020 | 01/04/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.60m | £990 | £1.67k | £1.78k | £449 | |
|
Total expenditure | £649.99k | £345.14k | £6.02k | £5.74k | £406.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.59m | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £5.55k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £640.72k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £9.27k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £9.27k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 13 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2019 | 04 March 2020 | 32 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2018 | 16 October 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2018 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 06 OCT 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS ARE TO ADVANCE SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES (ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES) AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO ADVANCING THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY MAKING GRANTS TO CHARITIES ESTABLISHED IN ACCORDANCE WITH CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES AND FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window