LITTLE FEET (BEDFORD)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity was set up to raise money to help orphans after earthquake in Nepal in April 2015. The charity raises money to provide help to two orphanages in Nepal, by supplying food, clothes, shoes, medical treatment, medicines, learning materials, teaching programmes and by assisting with running the orphanages by paying for teachers' salaries and covering running costs of the orphanages.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Nepal
Governance
- 07 November 2016: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LIDIA ANNA TOPOLEWSKA | Chair | 21 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
PETER PATRICK LEACH | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
JAN CZYZEWSKI | Trustee | 22 April 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.32k | £3.59k | £2.85k | £1.07k | £916 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.76k | £4.49k | £1.74k | £762 | £1.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 08 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 23 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 14 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 10 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 29 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 29 OCT 2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 27 OCT 2016
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN NEPAL BY PROVIDING SUPPORT, FACILITIES AND ACTIVITIES WHICH ASSIST IN ADVANCING THEIR EDUCATION, DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS. 2. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE, THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS IN REGIONS AND COUNTRIES AFFECTED BY POVERTY, WAR OR OTHER NATURAL DISASTERS BY PROVIDING THEM WITH ACCOMMODATION, BUILDING SCHOOLS, PROVIDING FOOD AND CLOTHES AND ALSO MEDICAL ASSISTANCE
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 Maldives Terrace
Newton Leys
Bletchley
MILTON KEYNES
MK3 5GT
- Phone:
- 07516240919
- Email:
- anna@little-feet.org.uk
- Website:
-
little-feet.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window