Financial history FRIENDS OF HAYFIELD SCHOOL

Charity Number: 507215
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £3.65k £1.51k £684 £3.16k £4.72k
Total expenditure £27.65k £3.40k £1.32k £12.78k £3.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A