THE AITKEN FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 1168153
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

General Charitable Purposes. Trustees do not accept any unsolicited applications

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 16 February 2024

Total income: £402,109
Total expenditure: £455,052

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 July 2016: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ludlow Trust Company Ltd Trustee 05 July 2021
THE MARY STEPHANIE WARREN-COLEMAN TRUST
Received: On time
THE ROPER FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE KATHLEEN LAURENCE TRUST
Received: On time
THE PLASTOW FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE WESTCOTT FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE JECTUS CHARITABLE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE HSWJ TRUST
Received: On time
THE J VAN MARS FOUNDATION
Received: 1 day late
THE THOMPSON6 CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE CARLILE FOUNDATION CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
PAULINE MEREDITH CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
JOSEPH ETTEDGUI CHARITABLE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE RELITHAN CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE JOAN MARY WOODHAM HURRELL TRUST
Received: On time
THE TORNS CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE WHITEWATER CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE ETTLING CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE DR CORAL IRMGARD ALLWORTHY CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE PAYBACK TIME TRUST
Received: On time
THE REGINALD M PHILLIPS CHARITABLE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE CJM AND FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE CORTON HILL TRUST
Received: On time
THE FRAXINUS CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE GNINWOD TRUST
Received: On time
MILLIE'S WATCH
Received: On time
THE ORKNEY CHERRY CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE POLMAX CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE 4 BETTER FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE AQUEDUCT CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE BROWN SOURCE TRUST
Received: On time
THE CHIGA CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE EDWARD & CATHERINE WRAY CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE HURST LEA FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE LINDLEY FOUNDATION
Received: On time
MAURICE AND SUSAN ROTHSCHILD INCENTIVE TRUST
Received: On time
THE ROWLAND EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE SAMUEL FELDMAN NORTH EAST CORNER CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE SCSJD CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE LINDSAY TRUST
Received: On time
The Brindle Foundation
Received: On time
THE PRAFARATA FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE MARGARET ELIZABETH CORMACK CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE KENNETH MONTAGUE DICKINSON CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE DISCWORLD FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Alexandra Rose Aitken Trustee 02 August 2020
None on record
Lucy Amelia Aitken Trustee 02 August 2020
None on record
ANNA JENNY AITKEN Trustee 16 February 2016
None on record
PETER JAMES AITKEN Trustee 16 February 2016
None on record
KATHARINE GEORGINA AITKEN Trustee 16 February 2016
None on record
JANE KATHARINE REID AITKEN Trustee 16 February 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 16/02/2020 16/02/2021 16/02/2022 16/02/2023 16/02/2024
Total gross income £235.68k £811.42k £203.78k £54.42k £402.11k
Total expenditure £218.86k £910.05k £202.68k £299.04k £455.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £500.00k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments N/A £500.00k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment N/A £39.36k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other N/A £772.06k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £881.92k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £28.13k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £1.92k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £880.00k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £28.13k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 16 February 2024 05 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 16 February 2024 05 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 16 February 2023 04 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 16 February 2023 04 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 16 February 2022 09 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 16 February 2022 09 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 16 February 2021 08 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 16 February 2021 08 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 16 February 2020 15 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 16 February 2020 15 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Ludlow Trust Co Ltd
Tower Wharf
Cheese Lane
BRISTOL
BS2 0JJ
Phone:
01173138200
Website:

No information available