Accounts and annual returns HAND 2 HELP FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1169876
Charity reporting is overdue by 1125 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 29 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 29 days
Annual return 30 June 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 394 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 394 days
Annual return 30 June 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 760 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 760 days
Annual return 30 June 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1125 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1125 days
Annual return 30 June 2020 28 April 2022 363 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 28 April 2022 363 days late Download Open in new window