TURKEN FOUNDATION UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General charitable purposes Education/training The prevention or relief of poverty Accommodation/housing Religious activities Economic/community development/employment Human rights/religious or racial harmony/equality or diversity
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 30 January 2017: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
YASEMIN SOLMAZ | Chair | 01 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
MUHAMMED ABDUL KERIM YUSUF CEVAHIR | Trustee | 01 February 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £60.38k | £67.79k | £110.29k | £90.88k | £158.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.94k | £99.31k | £113.24k | £90.45k | £145.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 13 August 2024 | 74 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 13 August 2024 | 74 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 28 August 2023 | 89 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 28 August 2023 | 89 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 15 March 2023 | 288 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 15 March 2023 | 288 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 22 June 2021 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 22 June 2021 | 22 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 17 June 2020 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 17 June 2020 | 17 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14 AUG 2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 26 JAN 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: 1. FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF PEOPLE OF LIMITED MEANS FROM ANY PART OF THE WORLD WHO ARE COMING TO THE UK IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT, INCLUDING BY: A) AWARDING TO SUCH PERSONS SCHOLARSHIPS, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES OR GRANTS TENABLE AT ANY UNIVERSITY, COLLEGE OR INSTITUTION OF HIGHER OR FURTHER EDUCATION. B) PROVIDING FOR THEIR EDUCATION (INCLUDING THE STUDY OF MUSIC AND OTHER ARTS), BY ENABLING THEM TO UNDERTAKE TRAVEL IN FURTHERANCE OF THAT EDUCATION OR TO PREPARE FOR ENTRY TO ANY OCCUPATION, TRADE OR PROFESSION ON LEAVING ANY EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT C) SUPPORTING STUDENTS WHO FOLLOW THE ISLAMIC FAITH BY THE PROVISION OF ACCOMMODATION SUITABLE TO THEM TO PURSUE THE PRACTICES OF THEIR MUSLIM FAITH AND OTHER SUPPORT TO ASSIST THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO UK SOCIETY. 2. THE ADVANCEMENT OF SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE IN ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE IN THEIR SOLE DISCRETION PROVIDED THAT THE CHARITY MAY NOT FURTHER ANY PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAWS OF SCOTLAND OR NORTHERN IRELAND.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Turken Foundation UK
Ruskin House
40-41 Museum Street
LONDON
WC1A 1LT
- Phone:
- 02088888545
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window