Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF HARTLEPOOL'S WILD GREENSPACES (FHWGS)

Charity Number: 1165999
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 10 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 10 September 2024 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2022 13 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 13 March 2023 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2021 04 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 04 February 2022 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2020 15 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 15 February 2021 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2019 23 March 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 23 March 2020 On Time