Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. EDWARD THE CONFESSOR MOTTINGHAM

Charity Number: 1164675
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £134.96k £265.96k £353.67k £215.85k £136.29k
Total expenditure £88.28k £152.67k £451.98k £189.78k £143.84k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £16.60k N/A £18.00k £500 N/A