SNODHILL CASTLE PRESERVATION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To work with preservation organisations such as Historic England to rescue and preserve Snodhill Castle from total loss. Long-term maintainance planning. Long-term finanicial planning. Investigation and interpretation of the castle and its surroundings. Returning the castle as a public asset locally and nationally
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

21 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Gloucestershire
- Herefordshire
- Shropshire
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 25 February 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
21 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GARRY RAYMOND CROOK | Chair | 11 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Simon Hayward | Trustee | 09 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Liam Hayward | Trustee | 09 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Hayward | Trustee | 09 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lynda Hayward | Trustee | 09 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andy de Bell | Trustee | 09 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
SURREY GARLAND MA, FSA | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Lucille Nolan | Trustee | 29 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jenny Sanders | Trustee | 29 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Winterton | Trustee | 29 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sarah Anne Lewis | Trustee | 10 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joe Emmett | Trustee | 01 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Kate Hayward | Trustee | 01 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jade Beresford-Leigh | Trustee | 01 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Andrew Longman | Trustee | 11 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
BRIDGET ELIZABETH FOSTER BA, MA | Trustee | 16 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Lou MacIntyre | Trustee | 01 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
SUSANNAH CATHERINE GARLAND BA | Trustee | 01 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
BRIDIE SULLIVAN MA BA | Trustee | 01 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
SURREY THOMAS GARLAND BA | Trustee | 01 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
RUTH MABLE WOOLMER | Trustee | 01 February 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.00k | £9.45k | £1 | £9.35k | £10.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £34.00k | £51.91k | £1 | £14.03k | £5.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £15.50k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 25 Feb 2016
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PEOPLE OF THE VILLAGE OF SNODHILL, THE PARISHES OF DORSTONE AND PETERCHURCH, HEREFORDSHIRE AND THE NATION ("THE BENEFICIARIES"), THE HISTORIC, ARCHITECTURAL AND CONSTRUCTIONAL HERITAGE THAT EXISTS IN AND AROUND THE CASTLE OF SNODHILL ("THE AREA OF BENEFIT") IN BUILDINGS (INCLUDING ANY BUILDING AS DEFINED IN SECTION 336 OF THE TOWN AND COUNTRY PLANNING ACT 1990) OF PARTICULAR BEAUTY OR HISTORICAL, ARCHITECTURAL OR CONSTRUCTIONAL INTEREST, INCLUDING BUT WITHOUT LIMITING THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING ACQUIRING, RENOVATING, RESTORING AND UTILISING FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE BENEFICIARIES THE STRUCTURE, CURTILAGES, SITE AND ENVIRONS OF SNODHILL CASTLE, SNODHILL , HEREFORDSHIRE AND TO EDUCATE THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN THE GEOGRAPHY, HISTORY, NATURAL HISTORY, ARCHITECTURE AND ECONOMIC AND SOCIAL HISTORY OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT ("THE OBJECTS")".
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Green
Snodhill
Dorstone
Hereford
HR3 6BG
- Phone:
- 01981 550836
- Email:
- info@snodhillcastle.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window