ST FRANCIS ANIMAL WELFARE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Re-homing and care of homeless or unwanted animals and rescue of lost or injured animals. This is achieved through the maintenance of an animal re-homing shelter.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
Total income includes £1,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
56 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Dorset
- Hampshire
- Portsmouth City
- Southampton City
- West Sussex
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 18 April 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANNETTE LODGE | Chair | 30 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
Kerry Bailey | Trustee | 05 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Rogers | Trustee | 06 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alex Bendall | Trustee | 05 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Morris | Trustee | 04 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
GARETH PRAGNELL | Trustee | 30 May 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £55.85k | £185.96k | £107.59k | £96.82k | £81.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £152.73k | £136.62k | £141.69k | £175.96k | £190.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 15 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 15 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 20 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 20 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 20 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 20 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 30 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 30 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 31 July 2020 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 31 July 2020 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 18 Apr 2016
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANIMAL WELFARE IN THE LOCAL AREA OF HAMPSHIRE AND BEYOND FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THROUGH THE PROVISION OF AN ANIMAL RE HOMING SHELTER, CARING FOR ANIMALS IN NEED AND PROVIDING REHABILITATION FOR SUCH ANIMALS. TO PROMOTE IMPROVED ANIMAL WELFARE AMONGST THE GENERAL PUBLIC, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF ADVICE AND EDUCATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. FRANCIS ANIMAL WELFARE CENTRE
SUNNY SIDE
MORTIMERS LANE
FAIR OAK
EASTLEIGH
SO50 7EA
- Phone:
- 02380693282
- Website:
-
stfrancisanimalwelfare.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window