THE BRECK FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Founded in 2014 in memory Breck Bednar, a 14-year-old boy who was groomed & then murdered by someone he met online, we are at the forefront of efforts to help children & young people develop digital resilience & thrive online. We do this through education & campaigning, taking a 'whole community' approach. We are a South East England based charity, but our work has national relevance & impact.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 22 July 2016: Standard registration
- BRECK FOUNDATION (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rupert Coles | Chair | 11 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Megan Plenderleith | Trustee | 15 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lewis Oldroyd | Trustee | 15 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Melanie Manning | Trustee | 15 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Jane Smith | Trustee | 11 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Fraser Lyle | Trustee | 11 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Robin Parry | Trustee | 18 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Cole | Trustee | 14 June 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £235.61k | £225.18k | £189.31k | £256.26k | £244.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £167.68k | £143.65k | £227.28k | £257.52k | £330.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £38.10k | £5.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 27 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 27 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 31 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 31 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 16 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 16 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 07 June 2021 | 68 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 07 June 2021 | 68 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27 FEB 2015 AS AMENDED ON 22 MAY 2016 as amended on 27 Jan 2020
Charitable objects
THE PROTECTION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE FROM THE EFFECTS OF ONLINE GROOMING, EXPLOITATION AND/OR EXPOSURE TO INAPPROPRIATE CONDUCT THROUGH THE INTERNET, SOCIAL NETWORK SITES AND OTHER ELECTRONIC COMMUNICATION. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN THE ISSUES SURROUNDING THE DANGERS OF SOCIAL NETWORK SITES, ONLINE GROOMING AND OTHER FORMS OF EXPLOITATION; IN PARTICULAR THE PROMOTION AND EDUCATION IN PROPER SAFEGUARDING AND UNDERSTANDING OF ON-LINE SAFETY FOR ALL.”
Contact information
- Address:
-
34-35 Hatton Garden
Suite 3672
Unit 3A
Holborn
London
EC1N 8DX
- Phone:
- 01883621102
- Email:
- admin@breckfoundation.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window