RUSS INTERNATIONAL

Charity Number: 1167098
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Russ International is a charity working in partnership with the Russ Foundation India. Our UK work includes working on educational and awareness events with the public and in educational institutions, whilst providing grant funding in order to fund projects and programmes in Tamil Nadu, India.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2019

Total income: £1,888
Total expenditure: £2,236

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with professional fundraisers or commercial participators.

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England
  • India

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 May 2016: CIO registration
  • 22 June 2020: Removed (Removed by application)
  • 22 June 2020: Funds transferred to
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Total gross income £1.07k £22.45k £1.89k
Total expenditure £9 £21.42k £2.24k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2019 31 October 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 10 November 2019 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2018 09 February 2019 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 09 February 2019 9 days late
Annual return 31 March 2017 13 December 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 26 February 2018 26 days late