Financial history CHADS THEATRE COMPANY

Charity number: 507253
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £91.97k £36.25k £69.71k £89.72k £108.49k
Total expenditure £78.45k £40.27k £78.13k £81.76k £110.96k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £20.65k £2.67k N/A N/A