CHADS THEATRE COMPANY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity's objective is to promote the advancement of general education in relation to all aspects of the art of drama and the development of public appreciation of such art.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
110 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Stockport
Governance
- 24 February 1978: Standard registration
- CHEADLE HULME AMATEUR DRAMATIC SOCIETY (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Margaret Hutt | Chair | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Birch | Trustee | 27 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Ann Quaife | Trustee | 05 August 2021 |
|
|||||
Paul Richard Burt | Trustee | 05 August 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £91.97k | £36.25k | £69.71k | £89.72k | £108.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £78.45k | £40.27k | £78.13k | £81.76k | £110.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £20.65k | £2.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 24 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 24 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 28 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 28 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 21 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 21 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 30 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 30 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22 JANUARY 1978 AS AMENDED 21 SEPTEMBER 1980, 26 MAY 1982,16 OCTOBER 199, 11 JUNE 2003, 21 JUNE 2006 AND 18 JULY 2007
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT FOR WHICH THE SOCIETY IS ESTABLISHED IS TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF GENERAL EDUCATION IN RELATION TO ALL ASPECTS OF THE ART OF DRAMA AND THE DEVELOPMENT OF PUBLIC APPRECIATION OF SUCH ART.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Chads Theatre
Mellor Road
Cheadle Hulme
CHEADLE
Cheshire
SK8 5AU
- Phone:
- 0161 485 2764
- Email:
- info@chads.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window