Governing document CHADS THEATRE COMPANY
Charity number: 507253

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22 JANUARY 1978 AS AMENDED 21 SEPTEMBER 1980, 26 MAY 1982,16 OCTOBER 199, 11 JUNE 2003, 21 JUNE 2006 AND 18 JULY 2007
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT FOR WHICH THE SOCIETY IS ESTABLISHED IS TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF GENERAL EDUCATION IN RELATION TO ALL ASPECTS OF THE ART OF DRAMA AND THE DEVELOPMENT OF PUBLIC APPRECIATION OF SUCH ART.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.