Accounts and annual returns RODING VALLEY HIGH SCHOOL PTA

Charity number: 1165179
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 19 September 2024 05 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 19 September 2024 Not Required
Annual return 19 September 2023 17 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 19 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 19 September 2022 28 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 19 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 19 September 2021 17 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 19 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 19 September 2020 12 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 19 September 2020 Not Required