Financial history LUTHIERS SANS FRONTIERES UK

Charity number: 1168809
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £2.64k £3.77k £1.48k £1.32k £2.46k
Total expenditure £2.71k £3.34k £2.73k £2.18k £767
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A