Financial history One life global welfare Ltd

Charity number: 1165390
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £328.81k £192.46k £343.18k £682.85k £749.64k
Total expenditure £340.02k £159.35k £317.60k £656.87k £738.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £5.04k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £682.85k £749.64k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £656.27k £737.20k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £601 £841
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £1.86k £1.74k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0