MANIFOLD WISDOM HOUSE MINISTRY LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
religion activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charitable Activities
- City Of London
Governance
- 02 June 2016: Standard registration
- MANIFOLD WISDOM HOUSE MINISTRY (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARIAMA LELEI | Trustee | 07 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
THERESA VONU | Trustee | 07 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
PASTOR RICHARD CHUCKWUMA | Trustee | 30 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
CHUKS EGWAHOR | Trustee | 30 January 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.40k | £3.76k | £4.73k | £4.73k | £4.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.47k | £6.17k | £5.43k | £5.43k | £5.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 18 February 2025 | 80 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 26 June 2024 | 209 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 26 June 2024 | 574 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 08 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 05 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 30 JAN 2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13 MAR 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 01 JUN 2016
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH (IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS) IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 CARLTON ROAD
WELLING
DA16 1QH
- Phone:
- 079833953889
- Email:
- RIKHENRY2000@YAHOO.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window