LEVI'S PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We as a charity raise awareness & funds by holding event's in & around Milton Keynes, these include, fun days, live music event's, tabletop sales, themed evening's & auctions. We also invite people to hold sponsored event's. We have a small group of family & friends that help the charity. We give grant's to families affected & are raising funds for a holiday home for them to use free of charge.
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 03 February 2016: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LYNN BARNES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID BARNES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 09 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 311 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 09 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 311 days | |
Annual return | 09 September 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 677 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 09 September 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 677 days | |
Annual return | 09 September 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1042 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 09 September 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1042 days | |
Annual return | 09 September 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1407 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 09 September 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1407 days | |
Annual return | 09 September 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1772 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 09 September 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1772 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 03 Feb 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF SUFFERERS OF RETINOBLASTOMA AND OSTEOSARCOMA, THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS IN THE UK, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FREE HOLIDAY ACCOMMODATION, INFORMATION ADVICE AND PRACTICAL SUPPORT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
20 Earls Willow
New Bradwell
MILTON KEYNES
MK13 0EX
- Phone:
- 07514714878
- Email:
- kelly_barnes@sky.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window