AFRICAN VOICE IN MOSTON

Charity Number: 1165418
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Supports isolated individuals and families through Outreach, Counselling, Advocacy and Referrals. We Promote youth inclusion, understand diverse cultures and Promote volunteering within the community . Well-being and Budgeting,Culture understanding, Networking .Supporting Depressed and struggling families. Sign-posting. Immigration Advice referrals. Food Bank.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £62,000
Total expenditure: £52,000

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Manchester City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 February 2016: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • AVIM (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
IBRAHIMA MBAYE Chair 31 October 2019
None on record
YORISOLA OLADEJO Trustee 30 March 2023
None on record
CYNTHIA OMOREGBE Trustee 30 March 2023
None on record
ADESHOLA BANKOLE Trustee 30 March 2023
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £9.00k £20.48k £23.17k £24.44k £62.00k
Total expenditure £8.85k £17.63k £24.26k £18.31k £52.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.95k N/A £6.16k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 23 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 23 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 11 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 11 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 21 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 21 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 28 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 28 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 02 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 02 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
54 Kilnside Drive
Harpurhey
MANCHESTER
M9 5QP
Phone:
01613121244