FREE TO BE KIDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Free to Be Kids provides respite holidays, therapeutic adventures, after-school support and a range of year round residentials for children who are struggling with social or emotional difficulties, significant social/financial disadvantage or who are growing up in marginalised communities. Without our work, many would not have support or a break from often extremely difficult home circumstances.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£663,991
Donations and legacies | £641.67k | |
Charitable activities | £22.25k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £70 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£600,461
Raising funds | £59.88k | |
Charitable activities | £540.58k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £33,470 from 5 government contract(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £59.88k | |
Charitable expenditure | £540.58k | |
Retained for future use | £63.53k |
People

7 Employee(s)
11 Trustee(s)
210 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Buckinghamshire
- Cambridgeshire
- East Sussex
- Essex
- Hertfordshire
- Kent
- Oxfordshire
- Surrey
- West Sussex
- Throughout London
Governance
- 22 February 2016: CIO registration
- 22 February 2024: Funds received from 265840 OLIVER '68
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emma Kendall | Chair | 11 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Theresa Anne Dauncey | Trustee | 22 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amy-Kate Robinson | Trustee | 22 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joel Nathanael Campbell-Brazier | Trustee | 22 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Olusola Adebiyi | Trustee | 16 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elena Davies | Trustee | 15 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Beulah Antonin | Trustee | 11 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Nicholas | Trustee | 11 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Leila Shepherd-North | Trustee | 11 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr GEMMA CHENEY | Trustee | 20 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rosie Macpherson | Trustee | 20 January 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/12/2019 | 05/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £202.99k | £191.56k | £456.81k | £412.03k | £663.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £187.31k | £146.63k | £264.34k | £428.03k | £600.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £36.80k | £41.08k | £33.47k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £5.00k | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £641.67k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £22.25k | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £70 | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £540.58k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £59.88k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.91k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 05/12/2019 | 05/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £5.92k | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £338.69k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £25.64k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 28 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 December 2020 | 05 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 December 2020 | 05 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 December 2019 | 04 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 December 2019 | 04 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 22 Feb 2016 as amended on 10 Apr 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF FREE TO BE KIDS AS THEY APPEAR WITHIN SECTION (3) (THE "OBJECTS" CLAUSE) OF THE GOVERNING DOCUMENT ARE AS FOLLOWS: 3. OBJECT[S] (1) THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE RELIEF OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE RESIDING IN LONDON AND THE SOUTH-EAST, OR ANY OTHER UK LOCATION WITH A SIMILAR NEED PROFILE AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE, WHO ARE IN NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE VIA THE PROVISION OF SERVICES THAT: (A) SUPPORT THEM TO DEVELOP BETTER EMOTIONAL HEALTH, BUILD INNER STRENGTHS TO OVERCOME CHALLENGES WITHIN THEIR LIVES AND CONSEQUENTLY TO MANAGE BETTER WITHIN SOCIAL RELATIONSHIPS AT HOME, SCHOOL OR WITHIN THEIR COMMUNITIES. (B) PROVIDE PRACTICAL SUPPORT, ADVICE OR GUIDANCE. (C) INCREASE ACCESS TO NEW OR ENRICHING EXPERIENCES THAT WILL FACILITATE SOCIAL LEARNING AND THE DEVELOPMENT OF NEW SKILLS. (2) IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, WE WILL PROVIDE: (A) A RANGE OF THERAPEUTIC ADVENTURES AND RESIDENTIAL PROJECTS. (B) INDIVIDUAL MENTORING SUPPORT. (C) GROUP BASED ACTIVITIES WITH A THERAPEUTIC COMPONENT. (D) GROUP BASED ACTIVITIES THAT SUPPORT THE DEVELOPMENT OF NEW LIFE SKILLS. (3) DEFINITIONS: FOR THE PURPOSES OF THESE CLAUSES: (A) 'CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE' MEANS INDIVIDUALS AGED 0-18. (SUPPORT MAY BE EXTENDED TO THE FAMILIES OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE SHOULD THE PRINCIPLE AIM OF THIS SUPPORT BE TO BENEFIT A PARTICULAR CHILD OR YOUNG PERSON WITHIN THE FAMILY.) (B) 'LONDON AND THE SOUTH EAST' MEANS ANY OF THE LONDON BOROUGHS AND ANY COUNTY SHARING A BOUNDARY WITH A LONDON BOROUGH, NAMELY ESSEX, HERTFORDSHIRE, BUCKINGHAMSHIRE, BERKSHIRE, SURREY AND KENT. ADDITIONALLY THE COUNTIES OF OXFORDSHIRE, CAMBRIDGESHIRE AND EAST & WEST SUSSEX ARE INCLUDED WITHIN THE DEFINITION. (C) 'EMOTIONAL HEALTH' MEANS THOSE ASPECTS OF AN INDIVIDUAL'S PSYCHOLOGICAL MAKE UP WHICH AFFECT CAPACITY TO APPROPRIATELY RECOGNISE AND DISPLAY EMOTION, THEIR SENSE OF WHO THEY ARE IN THE WORLD AND THEIR CAPACITY TO RESPOND TO SOCIAL OR PSYCHOLOGICAL CHALLENGES. (D) 'SOCIAL RELATIONSHIPS' MEANS INTERACTIONS WITH OTHERS IN SOCIETY E.G. SIBLINGS, PARENTS, FRIENDS, SCHOOL TEACHERS, CLASSMATES. (E) 'THERAPEUTIC' MEANS EITHER INTRINSICALLY BY ITS NATURE, OR SPECIFICALLY IN THE WAY THE ACTIVITY IS SET UP, SUPPORTIVE TO RECOVERING FROM A DIFFICULTY OR PROBLEM. SPECIFICALLY IN THIS CASE DIFFICULTIES IN TERMS OF EMOTIONAL HEALTH. (F) 'RESIDENTIAL' MEANS THE PROJECT WILL CONTAIN AT LEAST ONE OVERNIGHT STAY AWAY FROM THE CHILD OR YOUNG PERSON'S HOME. (4) NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH UK LAW.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Free to Be Kids c/o Living Space
1 Coral Street
Lambeth
London
SE1 7BE
- Phone:
- 02037780323
- Email:
- hello@freetobekids.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window