ISLE OF AXHOLME PHYSICALLY HANDICAPPED SOCIETY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our charity provides a social service for our elderly disabled members in our area. We now meet for lunch and entertainment four to six times a year at a Venue with Caterers or at a Garden Centre. We also provide three gifts of provisions each year
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- North Lincolnshire
Governance
- 29 March 1978: Standard registration
- 29 January 2025: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- HUMBERSIDE SOCIETY FOR THE PHYSICALLY HANDICAPPED ISLE OF AXHOLME BRANCH (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2018 | 30/04/2019 | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.21k | £3.57k | £8.69k | £352 | £3.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.76k | £4.14k | £4.04k | £543 | £2.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 63 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 63 days | |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 428 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 428 days | |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 10 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 17 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 1 APRIL 1974
Charitable objects
TO ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT FOR, AND THE PROMOTION OF HAPPINESS AND WELFARE OF PHYSICALLY HANDICAPPED PERSONS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window