HADDENHAM UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of education of people not in full time gainful employment who are in their Third Age and the provision of facilities for leisure time activities. We offer a programme of educational and leisure activities. We hold monthly talks and have a variety of interest groups where members use their experience to promote friendship and common interests and to improve quality of life.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Services
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 29 January 2016: Standard registration
- 16 April 2025: Funds received from 1106990 GREATER THAME U3A
- HADDENHAM U3A (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Janet Mills | Chair | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sally Logan | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Annette Marsden | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sally Lajalati | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Parkes | Trustee | 16 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Linda Page | Trustee | 08 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Doreen Barker | Trustee | 23 May 2016 |
|
|||||
ANGELA MARIANNE HART | Trustee | 11 May 2015 |
|
|||||
MARY ANNE PATERSON | Trustee | 01 July 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.69k | £8.60k | £27.89k | £14.88k | £50.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £31.82k | £4.94k | £33.02k | £15.67k | £50.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 February 2024 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 01 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 SEP 2001 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 12 JUL 2018 as amended on 09 Nov 2021
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK, BY ALL MEANS INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 Marriotts Lane
Haddenham
AYLESBURY
Buckinghamshire
HP17 8BN
- Phone:
- 01844292393
- Email:
- chairman@haddenhamu3a.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window