THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF THE LLANIDLOES HOSPITAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Funding to provide help, comfort, equipment and luxuries to Llanidloes Hospital and Community medical organisations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Powys
Governance
- 15 March 1978: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MRS MARGOT JONES | Chair |
|
|
|||||
MORFUDD EDWARDS | Trustee | 15 July 2010 |
|
|
||||
ANEURIN JONES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
REVD JENNY GARRARD | Trustee |
|
||||||
BERYL CRONE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS MAY JONES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LENA MANUEL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LENA DAVIES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARY BROWN JONES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GARETH MORGAN MANUEL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.44k | £1.44k | £3.55k | £3.79k | £2.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.14k | £1.14k | £634 | £1.13k | £1.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 June 2024 | 231 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 March 2022 | 141 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 8 NOVEMBER 1977 AS AMENDED 23 SEPTEMBER 1983
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PATIENTS AND FORMER PATIENTS OF THE HOSPITAL AND OTHER INVALIDS IN THE COMMUNITY WHO ARE SICK, CONVALESCENT, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED OR INFIRM AND GENERALLY TO SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE SAID HOSPITAL. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3 OF THE CONSTITUTION).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Lon Glandwr
Llanidloes
SY18 6YS
- Phone:
- 01686412467
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window