BRIGHTON AND HOVE FAITH IN ACTION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The BHFA supports faith groups that deliver social welfare and community building projects in the city of Brighton and Hove. We achieve this by running partnerships between different faith groups that deliver similar services so that they operate more efficiently. We also act as an advocate for faith groups to secular authorities, promoting and defending the rights of faith groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 28 July 2024
Total income includes £18,555 from 2 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Brighton And Hove
Governance
- 30 March 2016: CIO registration
- BHFA (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Andrea Zanardo Rabbi | Trustee | 14 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Phillip Diamond | Trustee | 30 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Claire Louise Anne Ashenden | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert James Brown | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen John Martin Horne | Trustee | 03 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
MR Sabri Ben Amuer | Trustee | 06 March 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 28/07/2020 | 28/07/2021 | 28/07/2022 | 28/07/2023 | 28/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.46k | £39.33k | £44.87k | £17.66k | £39.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.80k | £29.53k | £31.35k | £35.86k | £37.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £7.66k | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.53k | £16.00k | N/A | £18.56k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 28 July 2024 | 15 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 July 2024 | 15 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 July 2023 | 08 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 July 2023 | 08 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 July 2022 | 18 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 July 2022 | 18 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 July 2021 | 22 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 July 2021 | 22 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 July 2020 | 22 November 2021 | 178 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 July 2020 | 19 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION REGISTERED 30 MAR 2016 AMENDED ON 27 JUN 2018 as amended on 24 Sep 2021
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVENESS OF FAITH BASED CHARITIES AND THE EFFICIENT USE OF RESOURCES FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES BY FAITH BASED CHARITABLE AND NOT FOR PROFIT ORGANISATIONS IN BRIGHTON AND HOVE WITH THE AIM OF RELIEVING POVERTY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC DISADVANTAGE BY DEVELOPING COLLABORATIVE WORK BETWEEN FAITH BASED ORGANISATIONS THAT PROVIDE SERVICES AND SUPPORT TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE, CHARITIES ARE ORGANISATIONS WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES. NOT FOR PROFIT ORGANISATIONS ARE INDEPENDENT ORGANISATIONS WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR PURPOSES THAT ADD VALUE TO THE COMMUNITY AS A WHOLE, OR A SIGNIFICANT SECTION OF THE COMMUNITY AND WHICH ARE NOT PERMITTED BY THEIR CONSTITUTION TO MAKE A PROFIT FOR PRIVATE DISTRIBUTION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Brighton & Hove Faith in Action
Community Base
113 Queens Road
BRIGHTON
East Sussex
BN1 3XG
- Phone:
- 07944594988
- Email:
- info@bhfa.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window