FOUNTAINS COUNSELLING SERVICE

Charity number: 1166723
Charity reporting is overdue by 646 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Volunteer counselling services

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2021

Total income: £1,274
Total expenditure: £2,668

Fundraising

This charity does not raise funds from the public

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Staffordshire
  • Stoke-on-trent City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 April 2016: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Professor Charles Lindsay Bashford Chair 25 February 2019
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY'S, DRAYTON IN HALES
Received: On time
SIR ROWLAND HILL'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE COLLEY SALTER CHRISTMAS FUND
Received: On time
DRAYTON RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
Sarah Watson Trustee 31 January 2022
None on record
SANDRA DAVIS Trustee 22 October 2015
None on record
ROB BELCHER Trustee 15 January 2015
DOXEY COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Charity reporting is overdue by 1648 days

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £23.59k £4.27k £12.63k £3.35k £1.27k
Total expenditure £6.58k £4.37k £6.63k £4.26k £2.67k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A £8.00k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 280 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 280 days
Annual return 30 September 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 646 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 646 days
Annual return 30 September 2021 11 August 2022 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 11 August 2022 12 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 23 August 2021 24 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 23 August 2021 24 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 15 March 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 15 March 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
3 THE MOUNT
MOUNT LANE
MARKET DRAYTON
TF9 1AG
Phone:
07980387847