ANONYMOUS CHILD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects are (for the public benefit): a) the relief of those in need because of youth,age,ill-health,disability, financial hardship or other disadvantage.We aim to fulfill this by supporting and providing education initiatives such as mentorship programmes, scholarships and grants; and b) any other solely charitable purpose for the public benefit under English law as the trustees may specify
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout London
- Germany
- Peru
- Philippines
Governance
- 22 April 2016: CIO registration
- AC (Working name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GEORG PHILIPP ETTSTALLER | Chair | 22 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jorge Sandoval | Trustee | 07 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dina Lorentz | Trustee | 07 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Alexia Karavis | Trustee | 08 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Eva-Maria Baumer | Trustee | 08 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
PAUL MUELLER | Trustee | 22 April 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.74k | £10.00k | £8.40k | £740 | £1.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.18k | £8.00k | £11.84k | £535 | £343 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 198 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 198 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 564 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 564 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 November 2021 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 November 2021 | 22 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 November 2021 | 387 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 22 November 2021 | 387 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 22 APR 2016 AMENDED ON 06 JUL 2017
Charitable objects
A) THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BECAUSE OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE. THE CHARITY AIMS TO FULFIL ITS AIM BY SUPPORTING AND PROVIDING EDUCATION INITIATIVES SUCH AS MENTORSHIP PROGRAMMES, SCHOLARSHIPS AND GRANTS; AND B) ANY OTHER PURPOSE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT WHICH IS SOLELY CHARITABLE UNDER ENGLISH LAW AS THE TRUSTEES OF THE CIO MAY FROM TIME TO TIME LAWFULLY SPECIFY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
32 Park Crescent
London
N3 2NJ
- Phone:
- +44 7 89490 4947
- Email:
- INFO@ANONYMOUS-CHILD.ORG
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window