FALKLAND CRICKET CLUB LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote community participation in healthy recreation by providing facilities for playing cricket.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- West Berkshire
Governance
- 03 August 2016: Standard registration
- FALKLAND CRICKET CLUB (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Leila Hewetson | Trustee | 22 February 2021 |
|
|||||
Mark Richard Lindfield Foster | Trustee | 22 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Trumper | Trustee | 22 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Neil Rider | Trustee | 22 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Graham Beal | Trustee | 22 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
MALCOLM GORDON BROWN | Trustee | 26 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT MARSON | Trustee | 26 September 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £441.59k | £422.46k | £245.95k | £208.95k | £210.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £81.80k | £52.11k | £109.64k | £132.80k | £174.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 27 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 27 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 27 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 27 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 12 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 12 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 20 September 2021 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 20 September 2021 | 20 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 22 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 22 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 26 SEP 2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12 NOV 2015 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 09 DEC 2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03 MAY 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE CLUB IS ESTABLISHED ('OBJECTS') ARE: 2.1 TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR PLAYING CRICKET ('FACILITIES' MEANS LAND, BUILDINGS, EQUIPMENT AND ORGANISING SPORTING ACTIVITIES); 2.2 TO PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR SPORT, RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF SUCH PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED FOR SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; AND, 2.3 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH SUCH MEANS AS THE DIRECTORS THINK FIT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAW OF CHARITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 Enborne Lodge Lane
Enborne
NEWBURY
RG14 6RH
- Phone:
- 0163547658
- Email:
- treasurer@falklandcc.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window