ST GEORGE EPISCOPAL CONGREGATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
advancing faith
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Norfolk
Governance
- 11 May 2016: Standard registration
- ST GEORGE ESPISCOPAL CONGREGATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev JOMON K PUNNOOSE BA | Chair | 01 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
RAJAN VASUDEVAN | Trustee | 01 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
NELSON DANIEL | Trustee | 01 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
BABU VARUGHESE | Trustee | 01 November 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.60k | £11.44k | £7.66k | £27.16k | £28.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.16k | £4.19k | £6.09k | £17.89k | £15.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 July 2024 | 161 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 10 July 2024 | 161 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 09 NOV 2015 AS AMENDED ON 08 MAY 2016
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE FAITH AND RITES OF THE SYRIAN ORTHODOX LINEAGE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE WORLD FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, WORSHIP SERVICES, LECTURES, PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE ON THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
17 Wadham Road
Gorleston
GREAT YARMOUTH
Norfolk
NR31 7NR
- Phone:
- 07903627019
- Email:
- st.georgeepi@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window