STORYHOUSE PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Operates as a cafe church with activities including the offer of pastoral listening; an accessible Christian presence; regular public worship, prayer, bible study, preaching and teaching; the teaching, encouragement, welcome and inclusion of young people; nurture and growth of Christian disciples; education and training for Christian community service; supporting social action in Sefton.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sefton
Governance
- 28 January 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael John Howard | Trustee | 09 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Eleanor Smyllie | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Geraldine Foster | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Condran | Trustee | 09 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Michael Hedley | Trustee | 02 July 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £188.58k | £197.92k | £216.90k | £213.92k | £324.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £195.62k | £170.32k | £197.60k | £229.43k | £367.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £48.79k | £23.16k | £4.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 25 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 25 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 25 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 25 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 28 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 28 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 29 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 29 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22 OCT 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC: (1) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES, PRACTICES AND TENETS OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SHALL THINK FIT; (2) ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE THAT IS EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SHALL DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIME.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Storyhouse
32 Liverpool Road
Crosby
LIVERPOOL
L23 5SF
- Phone:
- 07793862813
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
storyhouse.community
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window