NEWCASTLE NE1 CAN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charitable company's objects are for the benefit of children and young people up to the age of 25 years who live, work or study in Newcastle upon Tyne and its surrounding areas. To advance in life and help such children and young people by. To advance education. To relieve unemployment. To promote physical and mental health and relieve sickness and ill-health.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
Governance
- 05 August 2016: Standard registration
- NE1 SPACE2 LIMITED (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tariq ALBASSAM | Trustee | 09 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
PETER JOHN ALEXANDER | Trustee | 27 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN ROBERT WILFORD PATTERSON | Trustee | 27 November 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £100 | £600 | £4.49k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 April 2024 | 78 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 27 NOV 2015 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 21 NOV 2016
Charitable objects
4. OBJECTS THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (OBJECTS) ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO THE AGE OF 25 YEARS WHO LIVE, WORK OR STUDY IN NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE AND ITS SURROUNDING AREAS: 4.1 TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP SUCH CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE BY: 4.1.1 PROVIDING (OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF) RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; 4.11 PROVIDING (OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF) SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; 4.2 TO ADVANCE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT INCLUDING BY PROVIDING (OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF) FACILITIES AND EQUIPMENT FOR EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES; 4.3 TO RELIEVE UNEMPLOYMENT IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT INCLUDING BY PROVIDING (OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION) OF ADVICE, ASSISTANCE AND TRAINING TO FIND EMPLOYMENT; 4.4 TO PROMOTE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH AND RELIEVE SICKNESS AND ILL-HEALTH INCLUDING BY PROVIDING (OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF) ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE IN RELATION TO PUBLIC HEALTH, MENTAL HEALTH, SEXUAL HEALTH AND OTHER HEALTH-RELATED ISSUES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
SUITE A8
MILBURN HOUSE
DEAN STREET
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE1 1LE
- Phone:
- 01912113951
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window