THE SCUNTHORPE HOSPITAL LEAGUE OF FRIENDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The League of Friends supplements the service provided by the Scunthorpe General Hospital for health, welfare and comfort of the patients by the provision of facilities, which may be required for the treatment of patients. Also to provide or assist in the provision of amenities for patients and staff.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- North Lincolnshire
Governance
- 20 October 1978: Standard registration
- THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF THE SCUNTHORPE GROUP OF HOSPITALS (Previous name)
- THE SCUNTHORPE HOSPITAL LEAGUE OF FRIENDS (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Debbie Hitchen | Trustee | 05 December 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.60k | £5.38k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £52.04k | £18.28k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 06 February 2025 | 98 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 February 2025 | 464 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 February 2025 | 829 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 March 2022 | 134 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 14 March 2022 | 499 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30/06/1978 AS AMENDED ON 25/02/2016
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PATIENTS OF THE HOSPITAL(S) WHO ARE SICK, AND, GENERALLY, TO SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE SAID HOSPITAL(S).
Area of benefit
SCUNTHORPE AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
North Lincolnshire & Goole Nhs Trust
Scunthorpe General Hospital
Cliff Gardens
SCUNTHORPE
DN15 7BH
- Phone:
- 03033305577
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window