Financial history TREGARGUS TRUST CIO

Charity Number: 1165277
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023 31/10/2024
Total gross income £17.47k £3.80k £5.90k £13.47k £28.17k
Total expenditure £4.69k £1.34k £14.21k £19.46k £19.76k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £16.35k £2.19k £3.50k £5.68k £23.56k